Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Cibo

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503¹Born
12 Jan 153027.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Marseille, France
19 Jan 153027.0SucceededBishop of Marseille, France
15 Mar 155047.2DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Cibo
Bishop Giovanni Battista Cibo (born 1503, died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Death PlaceSignes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast