Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Allardeau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marseille


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1466SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
20 Jun 1466ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
1496¹ResignedBishop of Marseille, France
5 May 1506DiedBishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Allardeau:
Bishop Jean Allardeau (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marseille

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013