Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frédéric Ragueneau

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540²Born
30 Jul 157232.5AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
21 Dec 157232.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
26 Sep 160363.7DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Ragueneau (VIAF: 216309719)
Bishop Frédéric Ragueneau (born 1540, died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceSignes, Var

  • a bishop for 30.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 6 Nov 2017