Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Gault, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornTours
10 May 164045.3SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
14 Jul 164247.5ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
5 Oct 164247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
23 May 164348.3DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Gault:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Gault C.O. (born 1595, died ) Bishop of Marseille

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015