Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Jean-Louis Robert

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1819Born
23 Dec 184324.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 187252.9SelectedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
6 May 187253.1ConfirmedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
13 Oct 187253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
8 Jul 187859.2SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
15 Jul 187859.3ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
19 Nov 190081.6DiedBishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Jean-Louis Robert
Bishop Joseph-Jean-Louis Robert (born , died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnnonay, Diocese of Viviers
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alger, Archdiocese of Alger, Algeria

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 223, and Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017