Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste d’Estampes de Valançay

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹Born
12 Jan 168244.0AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
22 Feb 168244.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
6 Jan 168446.0DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste d’Estampes de Valançay
Bishop Jean-Baptiste d’Estampes de Valançay (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeufvy sur Beuvron

  • a bishop for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast