Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortuné-Charles de Mazenod

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marseille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1749BornAix-en-Provence
6 Apr 177626.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182373.8SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
16 May 182374.1ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
6 Jul 182374.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
29 Apr 183788.0RetiredBishop of Marseille, France
21 Feb 184090.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Fortuné-Charles de Mazenod:
Bishop Fortuné-Charles de Mazenod (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marseille

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013