Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Didier-Léon Marchand

Bishop Emeritus of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1925 BornLa Chapelle-de-Surieu
19 May 195125.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 197852.9AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
5 Nov 197853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
11 Dec 200176.1RetiredBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France

MicroData Summary for Didier-Léon Marchand:
Bishop Didier-Léon Marchand (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013