Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raoul de Chissey

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1350AppointedBishop of Grenoble, France
24 Feb 1351Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
28 Feb 1380AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
1386¹DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raoul de Chissey:
Archbishop Raoul de Chissey , Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 267, and Page 472
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014