Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Vittoz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Grenoble

Titular Bishop of Bitylius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1878BornVeyrins
24 May 190223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Grenoble, France
9 Nov 194062.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France
9 Nov 194062.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitylius
27 Dec 194062.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitylius
9 May 196384.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Vittoz:
Bishop Jean-Marie Vittoz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Grenoble

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013