Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Cairol de Madaillan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1712¹BornLimoux
28 Jan 176048.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Narbonne, France
28 Jan 176048.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
3 Aug 176149.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
25 Jun 176957.4SelectedBishop of Vence, France
29 Jan 177058.0ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
6 Oct 177159.7SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
9 Dec 177159.9ResignedBishop of Vence, France
16 Dec 177159.9ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
23 Jan 177260.0InstalledBishop of Grenoble, France
10 Dec 177967.9ResignedBishop of Grenoble, France
1788²76.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Grenoble, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Cairol de Madaillan:
Bishop Jean de Cairol de Madaillan (born 1712, died 1788) Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228, and Page 368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015