Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Louis Marie Joseph Mondésert

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble, France

Titular Bishop of Apollonis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1916Born
18 Oct 194225.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Belley, France
11 Jul 194326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Belley, France
4 Jun 197154.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France
4 Jun 197154.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonis
25 Sep 197154.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonis
11 Jan 199275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France
16 Apr 200992.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Louis Marie Joseph Mondésert (VIAF: 8193714)
Bishop Michel Louis Marie Joseph Mondésert (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillefranche-sur-Saône

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 773
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast