Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Simon

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1744Born
30 Jul 180257.7SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
2 Aug 180257.7ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
8 Aug 180257.7Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
3 Oct 182580.8DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Simon
Bishop Claude Simon (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSemur-en-Auxois

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast