Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Billard, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1696¹BornGrenoble
10 Apr 174751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
4 Jun 174751.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
29 Oct 175155.8DiedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Billard:
Bishop Joseph Billard O.S.B. (born 1696, died ) Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,475
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015