Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert de Bruillard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1765BornDijon
19 Sep 178924.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 182660.4SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
3 Jul 182660.8ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
6 Aug 182660.9Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
7 Dec 185287.2RetiredBishop of Grenoble, France
15 Dec 186095.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Philibert de Bruillard:
Bishop Philibert de Bruillard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble

  • a priest for 71.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013