Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Fenouillet

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
10 Sep 160830.7AppointedBishop of Montpellier, France
2 Nov 160830.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
24 Nov 165274.9DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Fenouillet:
Bishop Pierre Fenouillet (died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013