Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de St-Marcel d’Avançon

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1535Born
7 Feb 156024.7AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
9 Jun 160065.1DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de St-Marcel d’Avançon
Archbishop Guillaume de St-Marcel d’Avançon (born , died ) Archbishop of Embrun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble, Diocese of Grenoble
Death PlaceGrenoble, Diocese of Grenoble

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast