Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul de Chaulnes

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1650³Born
7 Apr 169241.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 170151.3SelectedBishop of Sarlat, France
6 Feb 170251.5ConfirmedBishop of Sarlat, France
26 Mar 170251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
13 Jun 172170.9ResignedBishop of Sarlat, France
16 Jun 172170.9AppointedBishop of Grenoble, France
20 Oct 172575.3DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul de Chaulnes
Bishop Paul de Chaulnes (born Jul 1650, died ) Bishop of Grenoble

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212, and Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast