Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Anne-Hippolyte Hay de Bonteville

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1741BornMoulins
11 Aug 177635.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
16 Sep 177635.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
6 Oct 177635.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
29 Aug 177938.0SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
10 Dec 177938.3ResignedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
13 Dec 177938.3ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
6 Oct 178847.1DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Anne-Hippolyte Hay de Bonteville:
Bishop Marie-Anne-Hippolyte Hay de Bonteville (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217, and Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015