Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Pellet, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Rhithymna

Superior General of Society of African Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1859Born
19 May 188323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
15 Jul 189535.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
15 Jul 189535.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
25 Aug 189535.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
2 Jun 1902³42.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
9 Sep 190747.8AppointedSuperior General of Society of African Missions
11 Mar 191454.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Pellet
Bishop Paul Pellet S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Costa di Benin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSte-Anne-sur-Gervonde, France
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 481
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast