Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipion-Jérôme Bégon

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1681Born
10 Jan 172139.2SelectedBishop of Toul, France
15 Mar 172341.4ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
25 Apr 172341.5Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
28 Dec 175372.2DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Scipion-Jérôme Bégon (VIAF: 5202032)
Bishop Scipion-Jérôme Bégon (born , died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrest

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast