Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph-Marie de Guernes

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1725Born
6 Aug 177045.3AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
26 Aug 177045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
13 May 179873.1DiedBishop of Aleria, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Marie de Guernes (VIAF: 29525189)
Bishop Jean-Joseph-Marie de Guernes (born , died ) Bishop of Aleria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambon sur Voneize

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast