Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel de Verthamon de Chavagnac

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1687Born
30 Jun 172941.6SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
28 Nov 172942.0ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
8 Jan 173042.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
25 Sep 176274.8DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Michel de Verthamon de Chavagnac
Bishop Michel de Verthamon de Chavagnac (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimoges, Diocese of Limoges

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast