Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Bernard de La Taste, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1692BornBordeaux, France
29 Nov 173846.7SelectedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
23 Feb 173947.0ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
5 Apr 173947.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
22 Apr 175462.1DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

MicroData Summary for Louis-Bernard de La Taste:
Bishop Louis-Bernard de La Taste O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015