Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hardouin de Châlon de Maisonnoble

Deceased

Bishop of Lescar, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1691Born
19 May 172937.7SelectedBishop of Lescar, France
23 Dec 172938.3ConfirmedBishop of Lescar, France
5 Feb 173038.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lescar, France
28 Oct 176271.2DiedBishop of Lescar, France

MicroData Summary for Hardouin de Châlon de Maisonnoble
Bishop Hardouin de Châlon de Maisonnoble (born , died ) Bishop of Lescar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martin du Puy

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast