Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-François-Ferdinand de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lombez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1734BornLa Haye, Netherlands
4 Aug 177137.1SelectedBishop of Lombez, France
23 Sep 177137.3ConfirmedBishop of Lombez, France
29 Dec 177137.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
1787²52.5ResignedBishop of Lombez, France
18 Nov 178753.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lombez, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léon-François-Ferdinand de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon:
Bishop Léon-François-Ferdinand de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lombez

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016