Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Clugny

Deceased

Bishop of Riez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1728¹BornAutun
12 Apr 177244.2SelectedBishop of Riez, France
1 Jun 177244.4ConfirmedBishop of Riez, France
21 Jun 177244.4Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
1814¹86.0DiedBishop of Riez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Clugny:
Bishop François de Clugny (born 1728, died 1814) Bishop of Riez

  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015