Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Barthélemi de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1691BornSainte-Mondane
18 Dec 171726.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 173544.1SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
19 Dec 173544.3ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
22 Jan 173644.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Jun 174149.8DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for François-Barthélemi de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon:
Bishop François-Barthélemi de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013