Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-François de Chatillard de Montillet-Grenaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1702BornChampdore en Bugey
1 May 173533.1SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
27 Jul 173533.3ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
2 Oct 173533.5Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
2 Apr 174240.0SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
6 Jul 174240.3ResignedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
9 Jul 174240.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
7 Feb 177673.9DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Chatillard de Montillet-Grenaud: VIAF:241534234
Archbishop Jean-François de Chatillard de Montillet-Grenaud (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 110, and Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015