Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François de Vivet de Montclus

Deceased

Bishop of Alès (Alais), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687¹Born
20 Oct 172740.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
8 Mar 172841.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
9 May 172841.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
13 Sep 174457.6SelectedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
1 Dec 174457.9ResignedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
18 Dec 174457.9ConfirmedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
21 Jul 175568.5DiedBishop of Alès (Alais), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-François de Vivet de Montclus
Bishop Louis-François de Vivet de Montclus (born 1687, died ) Bishop of Alès (Alais)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNimes

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast