Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germain Chasteigner de la Chasteigneraye

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1712BornAnthé, France
30 Oct 176351.5SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
20 Feb 176451.8ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
25 Mar 176451.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
29 Sep 178169.4DiedBishop of Saintes, France

MicroData Summary for Germain Chasteigner de la Chasteigneraye:
Bishop Germain Chasteigner de la Chasteigneraye (born , died ) Bishop of Saintes

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016