Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean d’Yse (d’Ize) de Saléon

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1671¹BornGrenoble
1698¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 172857.1SelectedBishop of Digne, France
26 Nov 172857.9SelectedBishop of Agen, France
8 Feb 173059.1ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
16 Apr 173059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
8 Oct 173564.7SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
1 Dec 173564.9ResignedBishop of Agen, France
11 Apr 173665.2ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
11 Sep 174675.6SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
26 Nov 174675.9ResignedBishop of Rodez, France
19 Dec 174675.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
10 Feb 175180.1DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Yse (d’Ize) de Saléon:
Archbishop Jean d’Yse (d’Ize) de Saléon (born 1671, died ) Archbishop of Vienne

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196, and Page 361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 441
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015