Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Joseph des Laurents

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1713BornAvignon
19 Apr 176754.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
10 Jul 176754.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
2 Aug 176754.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
17 Oct 176754.6InstalledBishop of Saint-Malo, France
15 Oct 178572.6DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Joseph des Laurents:
Bishop Antoine-Joseph des Laurents (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015