Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Marie-Joseph-Henri de Provenchères

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1904Born
1 Nov 192723.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Moulins, France
7 Apr 192823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Moulins, France
3 Nov 194541.1AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
18 Jan 194641.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
30 Nov 197874.2RetiredArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
2 Jun 198479.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie-Joseph-Henri de Provenchères (VIAF: 54243233)
Archbishop Charles-Marie-Joseph-Henri de Provenchères (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins, Diocese of Moulins
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Moulins, Diocese of Moulins
Death PlaceAix, Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast