Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ravizza

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornOrvieto
19 Mar 166752.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
20 Mar 166752.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
1670¹55.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
22 May 167560.4DiedTitular Bishop of Sidon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ravizza:
Bishop Francesco Ravizza (died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

  • a bishop for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 315
  • ob: CB, 22 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013