Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice Rigobert Marie-Sainte

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1928Born
21 Dec 195527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
19 Dec 196840.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
19 Dec 196840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
12 Oct 196941.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
4 Jul 197244.5AppointedArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
8 Jan 200476.0RetiredArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
27 Aug 201789.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Maurice Rigobert Marie-Sainte
Archbishop Maurice Rigobert Marie-Sainte (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalata
Death PlaceSainte-Anne, Archdiocese of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Aug 2017