Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Juan Balaguer Camarasa, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornVaglievar, Spain
12 Feb 163538.1AppointedBishop of Malta
18 Feb 163538.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
25 Mar 163538.2InstalledBishop of Malta
5 Dec 166366.9DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Juan Balaguer Camarasa:
Bishop Miguel Juan Balaguer Camarasa O.S.Io.Hieros. (died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 238
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 95, Number 569
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 161, Number 1,016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015