Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Rizzolati, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1799Born
182020.1ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
30 Aug 183939.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
3 Sep 183939.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
19 Jul 184040.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
27 Jan 185656.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
16 Apr 186262.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Houkouang, China

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Rizzolati
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Rizzolati O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClauzetto, Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
Ordained BishopShansi
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 21
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 271, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 371, Ascendance
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,996

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast