Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Goa e Damão

Archidioecesis Goana et Damanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 1 May 1928
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 4,194 (1,619 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archgoadaman.org/
  • Mailing Address: Paco Patriarcal, P.O. Box 216, Altinho, Panjim, Goa-403001, India
  • Telephone: (0832)2223.353; 2225.291
  • Fax: 2224.139

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Goa
31 January 1533ErectedDiocese of Funchal Diocese of Goa (erected)
Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde (erected)
Archdiocese of Goa
4 February 1558ElevatedDiocese of Goa Archdiocese of Goa
1637Territory LostArchdiocese of Goa Vicariate Apostolic of Idalcan / Deccan / Bijapur (erected)
1 September 1886Territory LostArchdiocese of Goa Diocese of Damão (erected)
Archdiocese of Goa e Damão
1 May 1928UnitedDiocese of Damão
Archdiocese of Goa
Archdiocese of Goa e Damão
19 September 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Goa e Damão
Diocese of Poona
Diocese of Belgaum (erected)
1 January 1976ElevatedArchdiocese of Goa e Damão (No longer a metropolitan)
25 November 2006ElevatedArchdiocese of Goa e Damão (Became a metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Goa e Damão
1970259,660655,70039.6%608124732354189627148ap1971
1980424,5001,106,85038.4%460188648655232764158ap1981
1990385,0761,852,00020.8%404178582661366744160ap1991
1999451,2201,442,91331.3%361247608742450951166ap2000
2000453,4501,445,91531.4%365244609744423955162ap2001
2001458,4501,446,21931.7%370245615745507944163ap2002
2002450,1301,502,05730.0%371248619727450941162ap2003
2003449,8181,665,99427.0%364248612734424888165ap2004
2004454,9261,685,33527.0%382226608748386849165ap2005
2006627,4001,763,59835.6%377253630995436870166ap2007
2013640,6161,818,00035.2%449252701913455965167ap2014
2016657,4292,121,00031.0%389358747880562877ap2017*

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast