Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Neri Cardinal Corsini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614²BornFlorence
12 Aug 165238.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
1 Sep 165238.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
14 Jan 166450.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 166652.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
8 Feb 167258.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Arezzo, Italy
7 Mar 167763.2ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
19 Sep 167864.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Neri Corsini:
Cardinal Neri Corsini (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 115, Number 700
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 172
  • The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013