Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Michele Cardinal Saraceni

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1498Born
21 Jun 153132.5AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
23 Mar 153637.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
20 Nov 155152.9Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155153.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
155657.0ResignedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
24 Mar 155758.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
13 Sep 156061.7AppointedAdministrator of Lecce, Italy
29 Nov 156061.9ResignedAdministrator of Lecce, Italy
7 Feb 156566.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
7 Nov 156566.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
7 Oct 156667.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
27 Apr 156869.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Michele Saraceni (VIAF: 72567829)
Giovanni Michele Cardinal Saraceni (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Family Tomb, S. Maria a Formello, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.0 years
  • a cardinal for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 30 Oct 2017