Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Jules François Calmels, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Official to Morocco

Titular Bishop of Dusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1908BornVezins-du-Lévezou, France
31 Mar 193425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
19 Sep 196253.7AppointedSuperior General of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
22 Mar 197869.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dusa
6 May 197869.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dusa
14 Jul 197869.5AppointedOfficial to Morocco
18 Jul 198273.5ResignedSuperior General of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
24 Mar 198576.2DiedOfficial to Morocco

MicroData Summary for Norbert Jules François Calmels:
Bishop Norbert Jules François Calmels O. Praem. (born , died ) Official of Morocco

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015