Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco da Assumpção e Brito, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1726³BornVilla Rica
27 Dec 174923.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
12 Jul 175024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
29 Dec 177246.5SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
8 Mar 177346.7ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
3 Oct 177347.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
4 Oct 177347.2SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
20 Dec 177347.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
23 Jun 178357.0ResignedArchbishop of Goa, India
16 Dec 180882.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Goa, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco da Assumpção e Brito:
Archbishop Francisco da Assumpção e Brito O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Goa

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227, and Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016