Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Brancaccio

Deceased

Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1592BornCanneto
21 Sep 161927.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 162735.3AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
8 Sep 162735.3Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
28 Nov 163341.6Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 163441.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
12 Feb 163542.8ResignedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
13 Sep 163846.4AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
2 Jul 166371.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
11 Oct 166674.4AppointedBishop of Sabina, Italy
11 Oct 166674.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
30 Jan 166875.7AppointedBishop of Frascati, Italy
30 Jan 166875.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
2 Jun 167078.1ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
18 Mar 167178.9AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
18 Mar 167178.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
9 Jan 167582.7DiedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Brancaccio:
Francesco Maria Cardinal Brancaccio (born , died ) Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
  • a cardinal for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 134, and Page 371
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 89, Number 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015