Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1542Born
May 1575³32.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 157936.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 158542.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
4 Oct 158542.8Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
18 Dec 158745.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158845.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
11 Jan 159350.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Gonzaga (VIAF: 66492175)
Scipione Cardinal Gonzaga (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua, Diocese of Mantova, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Silvestro al Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSan Martino dall'Argine, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Santi Fabiano e Sebastiano, Church, San Martino dall'Argine, Diocese of Cremona, Italy

  • a priest for 13.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 23, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017