Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Clément-Joseph-Edouard Jacquin

Deceased

Bishop of Moulins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1881BornAignay-le-Duc
29 Jun 190625.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 194261.5AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
8 Dec 194261.7Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
25 Apr 195675.1DiedBishop of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Clément-Joseph-Edouard Jacquin:
Bishop Georges-Clément-Joseph-Edouard Jacquin (born , died ) Bishop of Moulins

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013