Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Mayer

Bishop Emeritus of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1941 BornKisdorog
21 Jun 196423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pécs, Hungary
23 Dec 198847.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
23 Dec 198847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
11 Feb 198948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
3 Nov 198948.7AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
19 Jan 201169.9ResignedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Mihály Mayer:
Bishop Mihály Mayer (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pécs

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pécs.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015