Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop József Szendi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1921Born
24 Dec 194423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
5 Apr 198260.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Veszprém, Hungary
5 Apr 198260.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
21 Apr 198260.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
3 Sep 198361.8AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
31 May 199371.5AppointedArchbishop of Veszprém, Hungary
14 Aug 199775.7RetiredArchbishop of Veszprém, Hungary
23 Jul 201795.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Szendi
Archbishop József Szendi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzékesfehérvár, Diocese of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)
Death PlaceVeszprém, Archdiocese of Veszprém

  • a priest for 72.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d/opd: CB, 25 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 23 Nov 2017