Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gellért Belon

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pécs

Titular Bishop of Elis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1911BornFüzesabony
17 Jun 193422.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 195947.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elis
23 Sep 195947.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
20 Nov 196453.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
5 Apr 198270.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
21 Apr 198270.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elis
6 Mar 198775.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
22 May 198775.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gellért Belon:
Bishop Gellért Belon (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pécs

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1987, Page 758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015