Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Pacca

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1756BornBenevento, Italy
14 Aug 178528.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178528.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
17 Apr 178629.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
26 Apr 178629.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
9 Apr 179437.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
Oct 1794³37.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
23 Feb 180144.1Elevated to Cardinal
9 Aug 180144.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
1802²45.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
18 Jun 1808³51.4AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
7 Jan 180952.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
7 May 1814³57.3ResignedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
26 Sep 181457.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
2 Oct 181861.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
29 Nov 181861.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
21 Dec 181861.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
13 Aug 182164.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1824²67.0ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
1830²73.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
5 Apr 183073.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
5 Jul 183073.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
19 Apr 184487.3DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Pacca (VIAF: 24780787)
Bartolomeo Cardinal Pacca (born , died ) Secretary of Universal Inquisition

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 58.0 years
  • a cardinal for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 10
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016